Ringo v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Donnie Ringo
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv00314
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JUDGMENT: Ringo's amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/14/2016. (jak)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Donnie Ringo hasn't responded to State Farm's motion for summary judgment, 21 . The time to do so has passed. If Ringo does not respond by Wednesday, 8 June, 2016, the Court will rule on the motion without a response. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/27/2016. (jak)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss; but Ringo may re-serve his complaint by 3 February 2016 to proceed on his breach-of-contract claim. The Court grants Ringo leave to amend to omit his bad-faith claim, and related punitives claim, which are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/5/2015. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ringo v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Ringo
Represented By: Julius D. Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: Emily M. Runyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?