Howell et al v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Robert E Howell, Sr and Does
Defendant: Wendy Kelly, Marvin Evans, Jr, Marshall Dale Reed, Lay, Crystal Wood, Bland, Foote, Debra Goldmon, Knight, Justine Minor, Cherry, April Gibson and Lisa Renes Hall
Case Number: 5:2015cv00316
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 71 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 7/25/2017. (ljb)
February 24, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 and 30 motions to dismiss. The motions to dismiss filed by Evans, Lay, Gleenover Knight, and Cherry, are granted to the extent that Howell's claims for monetary damages against Evans, Lay, and C herry, in their official capacity, are dismissed with prejudice, but denied in all other respects. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively terminate the 40 findings and recommendations entered on 12/16/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 2/24/2017. (ljb)
December 20, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 37 Recommendation. 34 Motion granted. Howell's claims against Gleenover Knight are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/20/2016. (jak)
June 1, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 10 Recommendation and overruling Howell's partial objections, 11 . Howell agrees to pare down his claims, but he still wants to cast a wider net than Rule 20 allows. Howell may proceed with his retaliation and cell-placement cl aims against Defendants Lay, Evans, Knight, and Cherry. Howell's claims against defendants Reed, Wood, Bland, Foote, Goldmon, Minor, Gibson, and Hall are dismissed without prejudice. If he wants to pursue those claims, then he must do so in separate lawsuits. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/1/2016. (jak)
February 1, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER partly adopting the recommendation, 7 . The Doe Plaintiffs are dismissed without prejudice because Howell doesn't have standing to sue on their behalf. Howell's claim against Kelley is now moot and is therefore dismissed without prej udice. In light of this change, the Court declines the remainder of the recommendation, 7 , without prejudice and refers this case back to Magistrate Judge Harris to determine which of Howell's other claims, if any, should proceed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell et al v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Howell, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Dale Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Goldmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justine Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Renes Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?