Muhammad v. King et al

Plaintiff: Michael Perry Muhammad
Defendant: A King, Snow, Chisom, Roe, Rory L Griffin and W Clowers
Case Number: 5:2015cv00320
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 61 the proposed findings and recommendations; granting 49 defendants' motion for partial summary judgment; dismissing without prejudice defendants Kimberly Snow and Mandy Roe; and denying 59 plaintiff's motion to dismiss defendants' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/15/2016. (kdr)
February 16, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in all respects 44 the proposed partial findings and recommendations; granting 35 defendant Rory Griffin's motion for summary judgment, and dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's complaint against Griffin; and directing the clerk to dismiss Griffin as defendant immediately. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/16/2016. (kdr)
December 10, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 19 the proposed findings and partial recommendations; and denying 9 defendant Rory Griffin's motion to dismiss and to revoke in forma pauperis status. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/10/2015. (kdr)
October 28, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 3 the proposed findings and partial recommendations in all respects; and dismissing, with prejudice, Muhammad's claims against defendants K. Hardgrave, CCS, and A. Gray. Pursuant to 6 Muhammad's request, Dr. Steve is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/28/2015. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Perry Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chisom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory L Griffin
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Clowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?