Cook/Solo v. Stieve et al

Plaintiff: Don/McC Cook/Solo
Defendant: Jeffrey Stieve
Case Number: 5:2015cv00366
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Defendant Stieve's motion for summary judgment 38 . All claims save those relating to the 3/27/2015 medical examination referenced in grievance MX-15-00906 are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/30/2016. (lej)
December 15, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 6 motion for TRO. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/15/2015. (ks)
December 9, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 5 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; and dismissing without prejudice Defendant Arkansas State Prison due to Plaintiff's failure to state a viable claim against it. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/9/2015. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook/Solo v. Stieve et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don/McC Cook/Solo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Stieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?