Ellis v. Simmons

Plaintiff: Tyrone Ellis
Defendant: Aric Simmons
Case Number: 5:2015cv00390
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 87 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 02/03/2017. (rhm)
October 18, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in their entirety 62 the proposed findings and recommendations and denying 52 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/18/2016. (kdr)
March 11, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 27 the proposed findings and recommendations; granting 20 Defendants' Motion to Vacate 4 the Order granting Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status; revoking 4 the 1/4/2016, Order; dismissing, without prejudice, 2 Plaintiff's Complaint; and directing Plaintiff to submit the statutory filing fee of $400 to the Clerk of Court, if he wants to continue this case, along with a motion to reopen. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/11/2016. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aric Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?