Jones v. Obi

Plaintiff: Michael Lyn Jones
Defendant: Obi
Case Number: 5:2015cv00394
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 34 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/1/2017. (ljb)
October 19, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 23 Proposed Findings and Recommendations as this Court's findings in all respects. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/19/2016. (ljb)
September 2, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety the 15 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's finding in all respects; and denying defendant Nwannem Obi-Okoye's 8 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/2/2016. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Obi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lyn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?