Ridgell v. Pine Bluff, City of et al

Plaintiff: Albert Ridgell
Defendant: Pine Bluff, City of and Debe Hollingsworth
Case Number: 5:2016cv00073
Filed: March 8, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2018 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court appreciates the parties recent filing, 47 & 48 . The Court has revised the voir dire along the lines the Defendants proposed. Updated version attached, which the Court will use. On qualified immunity: Hollingsworth made no timely motion for it; this is an issue of law for the Court, not one of fact for the jury. Hollingsworth is, of course, free to move for judgment on this basis after Ridgell rests. And if she does, the Court will rule on the defense based on the record at that pointy. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/15/2018(jak)
May 3, 2018 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Ridgell's official-capacity claim against Mayor Debe Hollingsworth is dismissed without prejudice. 34 Motion in limine is partly granted and partly denied. The Court attaches is working drafts of the (1) voir dire, (2) the preliminary i nstructions, (3) the final instructions, and (4) the verdict forms. Please file any suggestions for the voir dire, and objections to the preliminary instructions by Friday, 5/11/2018. Counsel should have 20 minute opening prepared. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/3/2018. (jak)
January 2, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED AND AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/2/2018. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ridgell v. Pine Bluff, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Ridgell
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Bluff, City of
Represented By: Amanda LaFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debe Hollingsworth
Represented By: Amanda LaFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?