Roberts v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Brunson Roberts
Defendant: Wendy Kelly, John Felts, Dawne Vandiver, Andy Shock, Abraham Carpenter, Jimmy Wallace, John Belken, Jerry Riley, Solomn Graves, Budnick and Mitchell
Case Number: 5:2016cv00138
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion to Dismiss. Mr. Roberts's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/7/2017. (mef)
March 1, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 73 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/1/2017. (mef)
October 13, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 40 Partial Recommendation. 32 Motion for summary Judgment granted. Roberts may proceed with the claims against Budnick and Kelley specified in the recommendation. His unexhausted claims against Budnick and Kelley are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/13/2016. (jak)
July 28, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for Defendant Lamb through the Arkansas Department of Correction Compliance Division and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the 2 complaint, 24 amended complaint, with any attac hments, and a summons without prepayment of fees, costs, or security. Mr. Roberts's claims against Defendant Mitchell are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to terminate Defendant Mitchell as a party Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/28/2016. (mef)
July 11, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to voluntarily dismiss. Roberts's claims against Felts, Vandiver, Shock, Carpenter, Wallace, Belken, Riley, and Graves are dismissed without prejudice. Recommendation 9 declined as moot. Motion 15 denied as moot. Recommendation 17 adopted. Motion for preliminary injunctive relief, 3 , denied. The Court refers Roberts's motion to amend, 19 , to Magistrate Judge Deere for consideration. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/11/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brunson Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Felts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawne Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Shock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Belken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomn Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budnick
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?