Paxton v. Richards et al

Plaintiff: Barry Paxton
Defendant: Shawn Richards, David Glass, Rory Griffin, Shelly Byers and John Wheeler
Case Number: 5:2016cv00256
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 88 Recommended Disposition. Richard's 73 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. Paxton's claims against him will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/27/2017. (mcz)
November 21, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the unopposed 71 partial recommendation as modified. The 33 motion for summary judgment is granted as to Glass and denied without prejudice as moot as to Wheeler, Griffin, and Byers. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/2/12016. (ljb)
November 3, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 motion; dismissing Paxton's claims against Defendants Wheeler, Griffin, and Byers; and instructing the Clerk to terminate those individuals as Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/3/2016. (mef)
October 19, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 60 Partial Recommendation and overruling 68 Paxton's engineering. Paxton's 3 Motion for preliminary injunctive relief is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/19/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paxton v. Richards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Richards
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Byers
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wheeler
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?