Grant/Rakim v. Kelley

Plaintiff: Abraham/Rasheen Grant/Rakim
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2016cv00305
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Grant/Rakim's 2 complaint is dismissed without prejudice. His 10 amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2017. (jak)
October 19, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 58 Partial Recommendation and overruling 61 Grant/Rakim's objection. The motions for a preliminary injunction, 52 & 54 , are therefore denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/19/2017. (jak)
September 22, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 38 Partial Recommendation and overruling 43 Bland's objection. 29 and 37 Motions for Summary Judgment are denied. 30 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. The Court adopts the 46 Partial Recommendation and overrules 49 objections. 40 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/22/2017. (jak)
January 11, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 3 recommendation, as modified; partly sustaining Grant/Rakim's 4 objection; granting 1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; and dismissing Grant/Rakim's claims against Director Kelley without prejudice; If Grant/Rak im wishes to continue with this case, then he must file an amended complaint against an appropriate defendant by 02/10/2017. If he fails to do so, then his case will be dismissed without prejudice. The Court returns this case to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. The Magistrate Judge will enter an Order with details about collecting the filing fee; and he will screen any amended complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 01/11/2017. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant/Rakim v. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham/Rasheen Grant/Rakim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?