Ellis v. Rawson et al
Plaintiff: Travis Homer Ellis, Jr
Defendant: Rawson and Kirtley
Case Number: 5:2016cv00373
Filed: December 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JUDGMENT: Consistent with 58 Order entered on this day, this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/6/2017. (cmn)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER approving and adopting 36 Partial Recommended Disposition and denying 24 Defendants' second motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/29/2017. (mef)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER approving and adopting the 18 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; granting in part and denying in part 9 Defendants' motion to dismiss; dismissing with prejudice Mr. Ellis's claims against Defendants in their official capacities; and allowing Mr. Ellis to proceed on his claims against Defendants in their individual capacities. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/28/2017. (mef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Rawson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Homer Ellis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirtley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?