Dodds v. Professional Transportation Inc et al

Plaintiff: Maryland Dodds
Defendant: Professional Transportation Inc, United Professional and Service Employees Union and United Professional and Service Employees Union Local 12222
Case Number: 5:2017cv00164
Filed: June 15, 2017
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Dodd hasn't responded to the pending 24 Motion to dismiss. If the Court doesn't hear anything by 5/8/2018, it will assume the motion is unopposed and proceed accordingly. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/1/2018. (jak)
March 14, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reminding Dodds of her obligation to follow the Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court directs the Clerk to send her another copy of 5 Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/14/2018. (jak)
March 13, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes Kyle O'Brien to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock on 3/13/2018 for a hearing in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/13/2018. (jak)
February 26, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting reluctantly 18 Motion. The 3/13/2018 status conference will be held in Courtroom 1A of the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 600 W. Capitol Avenue in Little Rock. The hearing will still be held at +4:00 p.m. central time. Dodds must attend the hearing in person. If she does not, the Court will dismiss her case without prejudice. Counsel for Professional Transportation must also attend in person. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/26/2018. (jak)
August 22, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Stay case. This case is stayed and administratively terminated. Joint status report due by 2/2/2018 and ever six months thereafter. The 7 Notice of related case is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/22/2017. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodds v. Professional Transportation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryland Dodds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Professional and Service Employees Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Professional and Service Employees Union Local 12222
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?