Aikens v. Kelley et al
Plaintiff: Alvin D Aikens
Defendant: Felicia Taylor
Case Number: 5:2017cv00247
Filed: September 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT: The issues having been duly tried, and after deliberating thereon, the jury returned its verdict on 10/12/2021 in favor of the defendant. It is therefore considered, ordered and adjudged that the plaintiff, Alvin D. Aikens, take nothing on this complaint against Felicia Taylor and the same is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/13/2021. (llg)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER approving and adopting in all respects 25 the Partial Recommended Disposition; granting 17 Defendant Taylor's motion for partial summary judgment; and dismissing, with prejudice, Mr. Aikens's indifference claim against Defendant Taylor. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/31/2018. (kdr)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Adopting 5 Partial Recommended Disposition. Mr. Aiken's claims for money damages against Defendant Taylor in her official capacity are dismissed, with prejudice. His claims against Defendant Kelley are dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/23/2017. (mcz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aikens v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin D Aikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Taylor
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?