Davis v. Sherrill et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth F Davis
Defendant: Jarred Sherrill, Nicola Kelly, Vineshia Barnes, Danny Burl, Carl Stout and Lorie Taylor
Case Number: 5:2018cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 JUDGMENT: Based on the 141 order filed today, judgment is entered dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/9/2019. (jbh)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER approving and adopting 109 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition; and denying 102 Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/13/2019. (jbh)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER approving and adopting 92 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in all respects; and dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Barnes. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/6/2018. (ljb)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER approving and adopting 57 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in all respects; and denying 53 Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/11/2018. (ljb)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER approving and adopting 47 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in all respects and denying 44 Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/22/2018. (mef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Sherrill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth F Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarred Sherrill
Represented By: Rosalyn L. Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicola Kelly
Represented By: Rosalyn L. Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineshia Barnes
Represented By: Rosalyn L. Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?