Lamar v. Kelley et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Lamar
Defendant: Moore, James Gibson, Wendy Kelley, Does Mental Health Counselor, ADC Commissary and Policy Management Team, Randy Straughn, Yolanda Linsy, James Shipman and Washington
Case Number: 5:2018cv00292
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 20 OBJECTION to #7 Partial Recommended Disposition by Anthony Lamar. (llg)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare the new summons for Defendant Moore for service in care of Humphries, Odom & Eubanks; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons and a copy of #2 complaint, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/4/2019. (cmn)
January 4, 2019 Summons Reissued as to Moore and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Defendant Moore and directing the USMS to serve Defendant Moore with a summons and #2 complaint without prepayment of fees and costs or security, at the address provided under seal #13 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/3/2019. (kdr)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by James Gibson, Wendy Kelley, Yolanda Linsy, James Shipman, Randy Straughn, Washington.(Guest, Ka Tina)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ka Tina Rena Guest on behalf of James Gibson, Wendy Kelley, Yolanda Linsy, James Shipman, Randy Straughn, Washington (Guest, Ka Tina)
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed. James Gibson served on 12/3/2018. (fjg)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Yolanda Linsy served on 12/3/2018. (fjg)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 12/03/2018 as to Moore. (fjg)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. James Shipman served on 12/3/2018. (fjg)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Randy Straughn served on 12/3/2018. (fjg)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Washington served on 12/3/2018. (fjg)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 motion for extension of time to file objections. Objections due 1/10/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/7/2018. (stm)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to #7 Partial Recommended Disposition by Anthony Lamar. (llg)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Lamar's first and fourteenth amendment claims on behalf of others be dismissed, without prejudice; that his due process claims arising from his transfer to the Varner Super Max Unit from 8/30/2017 until 9/20/2017 be dismissed, without prejudice; and that his #6 motion for preliminary injunction and evidentiary hearing be denied. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/27/2018. (csf)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Evidentiary Hearing by Anthony Lamar. (ljb)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Straughn, Gibson, Linsy, Shipman, Washington, and Moore; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of #2 Complaint, with any attachments, and summonses for the Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/20/2018. (cmn)
November 20, 2018 Summons Issued as to James Gibson, Yolanda Linsy, Moore, James Shipman, Randy Straughn, Washington and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoner-Plaintiffs. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to #3 and hereto for service/review by the parties. The docket text was modified to correct the description to include "The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Varner Unit." (kbc)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. Granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will not assess an initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff's custodians are directed to collect the $350 fee from Plaintiff's prison trust account in monthly installments and forward to the Clerk of the Court until the fee is paid in full. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Varner Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/16/2018. (jak) Additional attachment added on 11/19/2018: #1 Main Document - Correct. Docket text modified on 11/19/2018 to correct description. (kbc)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Lamar.(kdr)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Lamar. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamar v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Represented By: Ka Tina Rena Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Ka Tina Rena Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Mental Health Counselor, ADC Commissary and Policy Management Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Straughn
Represented By: Ka Tina Rena Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Linsy
Represented By: Ka Tina Rena Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Shipman
Represented By: Ka Tina Rena Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington
Represented By: Ka Tina Rena Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Lamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?