White-Wiley v. Evegreen Packaging et al

Plaintiff: Lisa A White-Wiley
Defendant: Evegreen Packaging and Van Hendry
Case Number: 5:2018cv00298
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to the Clerk for the Circuit Court of Jefferson County transmitting a copy of the case file and certified copies of the #11 Order to remand and docket sheet via certified mail. (jak)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to remand. The motion to dismiss and plead more clearly remains for the state court. The case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Arkansas. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/11/2019. (jak)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Motion to Stay Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Evegreen Packaging, Van Hendry. (Witherspoon, Carolyn)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Evegreen Packaging, Van Hendry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Witherspoon, Carolyn)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Evegreen Packaging, Van Hendry. Amendment to #2 Notice of Removal Exhibit 3 (Witherspoon, Carolyn)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Remand to State Court, Motion to Stay filed by Lisa A White-Wiley. (Sutter, Luther)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement () by Lisa A White-Wiley (Sutter, Luther)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement filed by All Defendants. (Witherspoon, Carolyn)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement by All Defendants (Witherspoon, Carolyn)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Lisa A White-Wiley.(kdr)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Evegreen Packaging from Jefferson County Circuit Court, Case Number 60-CV-18-7196. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT069712. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory James Northen on behalf of All Defendants (Northen, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White-Wiley v. Evegreen Packaging et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evegreen Packaging
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Hendry
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa A White-Wiley
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?