Woodward v. Gibson et al
Plaintiff: Robert E Woodward
Defendant: Henry, James Gibson, Robinson, Christopher, Bivens, Emery, Hart, Shipman, Scott Taylor, Carroll and Madden
Case Number: 5:2019cv00019
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Bivens, Carroll, Christopher, Emery, James Gibson, Hart, Henry, Madden, Robinson, Shipman, Scott Taylor (Hudson, Renae)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Renae Ford Hudson on behalf of Bivens, Carroll, Christopher, Emery, James Gibson, Hart, Henry, Madden, Robinson, Shipman, Scott Taylor (Hudson, Renae)
March 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare a summons for defendants and the United States Marshal to serve a copy of #8 second amended complaint and summons on defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 3/13/2019. (ljb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Robert E Woodward. (ljb)
February 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris added back into a Referral Role pursuant to #7 Order. (jak)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER withdrawing #5 Recommended Disposition; and directing Woodward to file an amended complaint within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 2/11/2019. (ljb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #5 Proposed Findings and Recommendation by Robert E Woodward. (ljb)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Woodward's complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; that dismissal of this action count as a "strike"; and that the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from the order adopting this recommendation and accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/31/2019. (ljb) (WITHDRAWN pursuant to #7 Order.) Modified on 2/11/2019 (ljb).
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Robert E Woodward.(kdr)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Varner Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Bank Office, and the ADC Compliance Office; directing the Clerk of Court to mail Woodward a blank 1983 form; and directing Woodward to file an amended complaint conforming to this order within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/15/2019. (ljb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Robert E Woodward.(kdr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert E Woodward. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodward v. Gibson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bivens
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emery
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hart
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shipman
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Taylor
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carroll
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madden
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?