White v. Elkins et al

Plaintiff: Edward Jerome White
Defendant: Darrell Elkins, Lewis and Tyra Tyler Johnson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00103
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that #2 White's complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; that dismissal of this action count as a "strike"; and that the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from the order adopting this recommendation and accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/29/2019. (ljb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Edward Jerome White. (ljb)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Jefferson County Sheriff; directing the Clerk of Court to send White a blank 1983 form; and directing White to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 3/26/2019. (ljb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edward Jerome White.(kdr)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward Jerome White. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Elkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Jerome White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyra Tyler Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?