Self v. Cherry et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Eugene Self
Defendant: Kentle, Cherry and Dub Brassell Detention Center
Case Number: 5:2019cv00138
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Kentle served on 4/29/2019. (fjg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Cherry served on 4/29/2019. (fjg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety #4 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition as this Court's finding in all respects; and dismissing without prejudice Self's claims against the W.C. "Dub" Brassell Adult Detention Center for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/6/2019. (ljb)
April 16, 2019 Summons Issued as to Cherry, Kentle and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Self's claims against the W.C. "Dub" Brassell Adult Detention Center be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/16/2019. (ljb)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Jefferson County Sheriff; and directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare a summons for defendants Cherry and Kentle and the United States Marshal to serve a copy of #2 complaint, this order, and summons without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/16/2019. (ljb)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Thomas Eugene Self. (ljb)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Eugene Self. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Self v. Cherry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dub Brassell Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Eugene Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?