Vandermolen v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Shane Vandermolen
Defendant: Ruby Tolar, Wendy Kelley, Raymond Naylor, Keith Waddle and Keith Day
Case Number: 5:2019cv00139
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion to amend. This case is closed; and nothing in Vandermolen's new paper warrants relief from the Judgment, #7 & #8 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/13/2019. (jak)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint by Shane Vandermolen. (kdr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT: Vandermolen's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/6/2019. (jak)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #4 Recommendation. Vandermolen's complaint fails to state a due process complaint and will therefore be dismissed without prejudice. This dismissal counts as a "strike". An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/6/2019. (jak)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBITS by Shane Vandermolen. (ljb)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Shane Vandermolen. (ljb)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Plaintiff's Complaint against Defendants be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim; recommending dismissal of this action constitute a "strike"; and recommending the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from an Order and Judgment dismissing this action would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/18/2019. (cmn)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Compliance Office, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the Warden of the North Central Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/18/2019. (cmn)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Shane Vandermolen. (ljb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shane Vandermolen. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vandermolen v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tolar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Waddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Vandermolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?