ConnectOne Bancorp Inc et al v. Star City Bancshares Inc et al

Plaintiff: ConnectOne Bank and ConnectOne Bancorp Inc
Defendant: Star City Bancshares Inc and Connect Bank
Case Number: 5:2019cv00159
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/5/2019. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court 6/20/2019. (slb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hani W. Hashem on behalf of All Defendants (Hashem, Hani)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Connect Bank, Star City Bancshares Inc (Hashem, Hani)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Star City Bancshares Inc. and Connect Bank by Connect Bank.(Hashem, Hani)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Hani W. Hashem on behalf of All Defendants (Hashem, Hani)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing of the Action regarding a Trademark forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by the Clerk of Court. (thd)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT AND UNFAIR COMPETITION with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by ConnectOne Bancorp, Inc. and ConnectOne Bank. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072050. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Modified on 5/6/2019 to correct typographical error) (kdr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ConnectOne Bancorp Inc et al v. Star City Bancshares Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ConnectOne Bank
Represented By: Michael Norris Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ConnectOne Bancorp Inc
Represented By: Michael Norris Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star City Bancshares Inc
Represented By: Hani W. Hashem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connect Bank
Represented By: Hani W. Hashem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?