Pitts v. Kelley

Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Pitts
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2019cv00162
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of USCA: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER as to #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (cmn)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER of USCA as to #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to pay the fee in the district court or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of this order. (cmn)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 USCA Docketing Letter as to #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts. USCA Case Number 19-2300. (cmn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #13 Notice of Appeal re #8 Order. (cmn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Order by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (cmn)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 MOTION for Reconsideration. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error - wrong image file (no file stamp). The correct document was added to #10 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Jurisdiction or Property by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (llg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration to Reject #9 Judgment by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (llg) Additional attachment added on 6/6/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)
May 31, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Judgment. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to #3 Order. (jak)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #3 the order entered on 5/20/2019, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/31/2019. (kdr)(Docket text modified on 5/31/2019 to correct the linkage)(jak)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #4 Kenneth Ray Pitts's motion for reconsideration; denying #5 motion to reject; denying #6 motion for replies; and denying #7 Motion for reply. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/31/2019. (kdr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reply the Order for Dismissed with Prejudice and Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Certificate of Appealability by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (llg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Replies to Order and Objection for Dismissal of Federal Habeas Corpus Petition by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (llg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Reject the Magistrate's Report Order to Dismissal of Writ of Federal Habeas Corpus by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (llg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Reconsideration by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (llg)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and dismissing this case, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/20/2019. (kdr)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (ljb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts v. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?