Hiley v. Donaldson et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Lamar Hiley
Defendant: Jamie Donaldson, Doe, Everett Cox, Dumas Arkansas, City of and James Edgerson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00195
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Copies; the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a copy of his Complaint along with a copy of the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/29/19. (tjb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Copies by Adrian Lamar Hiley. (llg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Adrian Lamar Hiley. (ljb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Adrian Lamar Hiley re #3 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoners. (fjg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Adrian Lamar Hiley re #3 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoners, IFP application. (fjg)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS denying without prejudice #1 IFP motion; directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an IFP application, along with this Order; and directing Plaintiff to 1) complete and sign the IFP application; 2) have an authorized prison/jail official complete and sign the trust fund account statement and certificate; and 3) return all forms to the Clerk on or before 7/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/14/2019. (kdr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Adrian Lamar Hiley. (llg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adrian Lamar Hiley. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiley v. Donaldson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Lamar Hiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dumas Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Edgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?