Ridgle v. Arkansas Department of Correction

Plaintiff: Latasha Ridgle
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 5:2019cv00197
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 and #3 motions for admission pro hac vice of attorney Heidi R. Burakiewicz and Michael Robinson. Ms. Burakiewicz and Mr. Robinson shall appear as counsel for Ms. Ridgle. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/9/2019. (ljb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Arkansas Department of Correction.(Jackson, Maryna)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Maryna O. Jackson on behalf of Arkansas Department of Correction (Jackson, Maryna)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Michael Robinson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3480276. Filed by Latasha Ridgle (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Burnett, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Heidi R Burakiewicz. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3480262. Filed by Latasha Ridgle (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Burnett, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Arkansas Department of Correction filed by Latasha Ridgle. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072592.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ridgle v. Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Ridgle
Represented By: John L. Burnett
Represented By: Michael Robinson
Represented By: Heidi R. Burakiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?