Hiley v. McGhee et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Lamar Hiley
Defendant: Stan McGhee and Dusty Dodson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00198
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Copies. The Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff the federal complaint forms he requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/30/19. (pdw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Copies by Adrian Lamar Hiley. (llg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Adrian Lamar Hiley. (ljb)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's prison trust account until a total of $350 has been collected and forwarded to the Clerk of the Court; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 Complaint form; and directing the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to the Dallas County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/10/2019. (kdr)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 07/10/2019. (lmc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Prisoner Account and Calculation Sheet by Adrian Lamar Hiley. (llg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Adrian Lamar Hiley. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiley v. McGhee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan McGhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dusty Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Lamar Hiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?