Parker v. Adams et al
Plaintiff: John Parker
Defendant: Adams, Doe and Baker
Case Number: 5:2019cv00199
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from John Parker. (llg)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall complete discovery on or before 02/01/2020 and file any dispositive motions on or before 03/01/2020. A Motion based on failure to exhaust must be filed by 10/01/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 07/31/2019. (lmc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Adams, Baker.(Hays, Caroline)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 07/25/2019. (lmc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by John Parker. (ljb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Witness List by John Parker. (ljb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Adams c/o W.C. "Dub" Brassell Adult Detention Center served on 7/8/2019. (llg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Baker c/o W.C. "Dub" Brassell Adult Detention Center served on 7/9/2019. (llg)
June 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Adams and Baker. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's institutional account, until a total of $350 has been collected and forwarded to the Clerk of the Court; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendants; directing the USMS to serve a copy of the #2 Complaint and summons on Defendants Capt. Adams and Lt. Baker; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the W.C. "Dub" Brassell Adult Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/24/2019.(kdr)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 06/24/2019. (lmc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Parker.(kdr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Parker. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams
Represented By: Caroline V. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Represented By: Caroline V. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?