Holliman v. Arkansas County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Antonio Terrell Holliman
Defendant: Arkansas County Detention Center and Patricia Snyder
Case Number: 5:2019cv00201
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to the Court by Antonio Terrell Holliman. (llg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to the Court by Antonio Terrell Holliman.(kdr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to the Court by Antonio Terrell Holliman. (ljb)
July 29, 2019 Summons Issued as to Patricia Snyder and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare a summons for Patricia Snyder and the United States Marshal to serve a copy of #6 amended complaint and summons without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 7/29/2019. (ljb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Antonio Terrell Holliman.(kdr)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER allowing Holliman to file an amended complaint within 30 days of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Holliman a blank 1983 form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 7/17/2019. (jak)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Antonio Terrell Holliman. (llg)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Arkansas County Sheriff; directing Holliman to file an amended complaint within 30 days; and directing the Clerk of Court to send Holliman a blank 1983 form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 6/21/2019. (ljb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Arkansas County Detention Center filed by Antonio Terrell Holliman. (llg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonio Terrell Holliman. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holliman v. Arkansas County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Terrell Holliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?