Bailey v. Grandy
Plaintiff: Thomas Bailey, III
Defendant: K Grandy
Case Number: 5:2019cv00213
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss be granted, and Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; #6 Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief/Temporary Restraining Order and #12 to Amend be denied; Dismissal of this action constitute a "strike;" and the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from an Order and Judgment dismissing this action would not be taken in good faith. Objections due within 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/21/2019. (kdr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court to he parties. (lmc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint by Thomas Bailey, III. (llg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas Bailey, III. (llg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by K Grandy. (McFadden, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by K Grandy (McFadden, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of K Grandy (McFadden, Daniel)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Thomas Bailey, III. (kdr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief or Restraining Order by Thomas Bailey, III. (kdr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. K Grandy served on 7/15/2019. (fjg)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 07/02/2019. (lmc)
July 2, 2019 Summons Issued as to K Grandy. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's prison trust account, until a total of $350 has been collected and forwarded to the Clerk of the Court; directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for Defendant K. Grandy; directing the USMS to serve a copy of #1 Complaint and summons on Defendant without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Ouachita River Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/2/2019. (kdr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against K Grandy filed by Thomas Bailey, III. (llg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Bailey, III. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Grandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bailey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Grandy
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?