Rabion v. Payne et al
Plaintiff: Korey D Rabion
Defendant: Dexter Payne and James Gibson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00216
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be granted in part, with respect to Plaintiff's allegations against them in their official capacities, and Plaintiff's denial of grievance claim; and Defendants' #10 Motion to Dismiss be denied without prejudice with respect to Plaintiff's First Amendment Free Exercise claim against Defendants. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/21/2019. (kdr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court to the parties. (lmc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Korey D Rabion. (ljb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Gibson, Dexter Payne. (Edwards, Brittany)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by James Gibson, Dexter Payne (Edwards, Brittany)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Nicole Edwards on behalf of James Gibson, Dexter Payne (Edwards, Brittany)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. James Gibson served on 7/22/2019. (fjg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dexter Payne served on 7/22/2019. (fjg)
July 16, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Director of the Arkansas Department of Correction shall collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the initial partial filing fee in the amount of $19.33 and forward that amount along with future payments to the Clerk of the Court. Service is appropriate for Defendants Dexter Payne and James Gibson. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for the Defendants and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the #2 Complaint and summons on Defendants. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the Arkansas Department of Correction Compliance Office, ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the Warden of the Varner Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/16/2019. (jak)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 07/16/2016. (lmc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Korey D Rabion. (ljb)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing Plaintiff to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/2/2019. (ljb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Korey D Rabion.(kdr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Korey D Rabion. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabion v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korey D Rabion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?