Khalifah v. Payne
Plaintiff: Taqwa Khalid Khalifah
Defendant: Wendy Kelley and Dexter Payne
Case Number: 5:2019cv00239
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #4 Order by Taqwa Khalid Khalifah. (kdr)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #4 Order. Response is due 9/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/21/2019. (csf)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re Filing Fee filed by Taqwa Khalid Khalifah. (ljb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections as to #4 Order by Taqwa Khalid Khalifah. (llg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Taqwa Khalid Khalifah. [Docketed pursuant to #4 Order] (jak)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 motion to amend brief; directing the Clerk to file an amended and corrected #2 brief that does not include pages 56 through 61; and directing the Clerk of Court to send Mr. Khalifah an application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/12/2019. (jbh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Brief in Support by Taqwa Khalid Khalifah. (kdr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Taqwa Khalid Khalifah. (kdr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Taqwa Khalid Khalifah.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khalifah v. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taqwa Khalid Khalifah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?