Rethore v. Kelley
Plaintiff: Michael Thomas Rethore
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2019cv00241
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #2 instant habeas petition be denied and dismissed with prejudice, and that a certificate of appealability be denied. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/26/2019. (ajt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A - Judgment/Commitment Order, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Appeal/Designation of Record, #4 Exhibit C - Amended Sentencing Order, #5 Exhibit D - Order Extending Time to Lodge Record, #6 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing of Appeal, #7 Exhibit F - Appellee's Motion to Dismiss, #8 Exhibit G - Ark. Supreme Court/Court of Appeals Docket Listings, #9 Exhibit H - Order Granting Appellee's Motion to Dismiss, #10 Exhibit I - Pro Se Motion for Belated Appeal, #11 Exhibit J - Order Denying Motion for Belated Appeal, #12 Exhibit K - Relevant Excerpts from Trial Transcript)(Rumpz, Pamela)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court to the parties. (lmc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Rumpz on behalf of Wendy Kelley (Rumpz, Pamela)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of #2 the petition and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General by regular mail; directing the Respondent to file an answer, motion or other response to the petition within 21 days after service of this petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/23/2019. (kdr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee received: $ 5, receipt number LIT073549. (Original receipt mailed.) (llg)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and directing the Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee within 30 days of the entry-date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/31/2019. (kdr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Thomas Rethore.(kdr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Thomas Rethore. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rethore v. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Thomas Rethore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Pamela Rumpz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?