Coleman v. Billy Barnes Enterprises Inc
Plaintiff: Kelly Coleman
Defendant: Billy Barnes Enterprises Inc and Shannon Douglas Sangster
Case Number: 5:2019cv00243
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Billy Barnes Enterprises Inc.(Fairley, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Billy Barnes Enterprises Inc. and added defendant Shannon Douglas Sangster. Summons issued for deft Sangster and returned to plaintiff's attorney, filed by Kelly Coleman. (jap)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff has 7 days to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/11/19. (dpb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint to Add a Party by Kelly Coleman (Bridewell, Robert)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/8/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/22/2019. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 8/24/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Billy Barnes Enterprises Inc.(Fairley, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Carter Fairley on behalf of Billy Barnes Enterprises Inc (Fairley, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by Kelly Coleman. All Defendants. (Bridewell, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Billy Barnes Enterprises Inc filed by Kelly Coleman. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073240.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Billy Barnes Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Barnes Enterprises Inc
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Douglas Sangster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Coleman
Represented By: Robert G. Bridewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?