Williams v. Kelley
Plaintiff: Terrio Sanchez Williams
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2019cv00253
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of #1 Williams's 2254 habeas Petition, #2 #5 the Court's previous Orders directing Williams to comply with Rule 2(c) of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases in United States District Courts, #6 #7 William's Addendum and Verification, and this Order on Respondent and the Arkansas Attorney General; allowing Williams 90 days to retain counsel in this 2254 habeas action; and directing Williams to, no later than 12/3/2019, file a status report, either pro se or through counsel, to indicate whether he as retained counsel. Respondent is not required to file a responsive pleading at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/5/2019. (kdr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 VERIFICATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terrio Sanchez Williams. (ljb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 ADDENDUM to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terrio Sanchez Williams (Signed page 15). (ljb)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to send Williams, along with this Order, the last two pages of Form AO 241; and directing Williams to, on or before 9/27/2019, sign the signature page of Form AO 241, if he wishes to continue with this action. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/28/2019. (kdr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #2 Order, by Terrio Sanchez Williams. (kdr)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE to #2 Order, by Terrio Sanchez Williams. (kdr)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to send Williams a blank 28 U.S.C. 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Form AO 241); directing Williams to, on or before 9/12/2019, sign the petitioner signature line located on the final page of the form to state, under the penalty of perjury, that his #1 2254 habeas Petition is true and correct; and advising Williams that, if he fails to timely and properly comply with this Order, this habeas action may be dismissed, without prejudice. Service of the Petition is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/13/2019. (jbh)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terrio Sanchez Williams. (Filing fee of $5 paid, Receipt #LIT073352.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrio Sanchez Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?