Holliman v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Terrell Holliman
Defendant: Bradley Wilson, Pamela Meeks and Crystal Cox
Case Number: 5:2019cv00274
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Holliman's prison trust account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; directing the clerk to send a copy of this order to the Arkansas County Detention Center; and, staying the case. If Holliman doesn't file a timely motion to reopen or status report by 9/16/2020, the Court will reopen the case and dismiss it without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 09/16/2019. (ajt)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonio Terrell Holliman. (ljb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Antonio Terrell Holliman. (llg)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for status update. After Holliman submits a completed in forma pauperis application, the Court will screen his complaint and determine whether service is appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/10/2019. (jak)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Status Update by Antonio Terrell Holliman. (llg)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Holliman's embedded motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing the Clerk to mail Holliman an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Holliman must either pay the $400 filing and administrative fees or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis in this case. If he doesn't do one or the other by 10/3/2019, then the Court will dismiss his case without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/3/2019. (jbh)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/26/2019. (jak)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Antonio Terrell Holliman. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holliman v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Terrell Holliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?