Walters v. Payne
Plaintiff: Raymond D Walters
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Case Number: 5:2019cv00357
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Walters' case be dismissed without prejudice; and that Judgment should be entered for respondent Dexter Payne. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/6/2020. (ljb)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Walters to either pay the $5 filing fee or obtain permission to proceed in forma pauperis. He is given up to, and including 12/20/2019 to either pay the filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall send Walters the documents necessary to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 11/18/2019. (ljb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Raymond D Walters. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters v. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond D Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?