Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.
Debtor: Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee (ust)
Trustee: Beverly I Brister
Case Number: 2:2024bk70811
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Bianca M Rucker
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Filing 47 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #42 Order Granting Motion To Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc #6) Entered on Docket 6/25/2024 (Mobley, Ashley) ) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 06/27/2024. (Admin.)
June 27, 2024 Filing 46 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #41 Order Granting Application to Employ Attorney (Related Doc #4) Entered on Docket 6/25/2024 (Mobley, Ashley) ) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 06/27/2024. (Admin.)
June 27, 2024 Filing 45 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #40 Order Establishing Proof of Claims Bar Date (Related Doc #5) Proofs of Claims due by 7/25/2024. Entered on Docket 6/25/2024 (Mobley, Ashley) ) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 06/27/2024. (Admin.)
June 26, 2024 Filing 44 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #39 Order Granting Motion to Escrow Funds for Advance Fees and Expenses for Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee (Related Doc #24) Entered on Docket 6/24/2024 (Mobley, Ashley) ) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/26/2024. (Admin.)
June 26, 2024 Filing 43 Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Sherman, Shari)
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order Granting Motion To Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc #6) Entered on Docket 6/25/2024 (Mobley, Ashley)
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order Granting Application to Employ Attorney (Related Doc #4) Entered on Docket 6/25/2024 (Mobley, Ashley)
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Establishing Proof of Claims Bar Date (Related Doc #5) Proofs of Claims due by 7/25/2024. Entered on Docket 6/25/2024 (Mobley, Ashley)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order Granting Motion to Escrow Funds for Advance Fees and Expenses for Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee (Related Doc #24) Entered on Docket 6/24/2024 (Mobley, Ashley)
June 22, 2024 Filing 38 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing(RE: related document(s) #36 Hearing RESCHEDULED(RE: related document(s) #7 Motion for Authority to Use Bank OZK as DIP Depository Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc., #25 Limited Objection to Motion to Authorize Depository for DIP Bank Account (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion for Authority to Use Bank OZK as DIP Depository Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. filed by Debtor Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (ust)) Hearing scheduled for 8/7/2024 at 09:00 AM at Fort Smith Division.) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 06/22/2024. (Admin.)
June 21, 2024 Filing 37 Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2024 filed by Stanley V Bond Debtor Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit) (Bond, Stanley)
June 20, 2024 Filing 36 Hearing RESCHEDULED(RE: related document(s) #7 Motion for Authority to Use Bank OZK as DIP Depository Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc., #25 Limited Objection to Motion to Authorize Depository for DIP Bank Account (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion for Authority to Use Bank OZK as DIP Depository Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. filed by Debtor Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (ust)) Hearing scheduled for 8/7/2024 at 09:00 AM at Fort Smith Division. (Carter, Angie)
June 16, 2024 Filing 35 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #33 Order to Submit Order(RE: related document(s) #5 Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) Entered on 6/14/2024 (Mobley, Ashley)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/16/2024. (Admin.)
June 16, 2024 Filing 34 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #32 Order to Submit Order(RE: related document(s) #4 Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Disinterestedness)) Entered on 6/14/2024 (Mobley, Ashley)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/16/2024. (Admin.)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order to Submit Order(RE: related document(s) #5 Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) Entered on 6/14/2024 (Mobley, Ashley)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order to Submit Order(RE: related document(s) #4 Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Disinterestedness)) Entered on 6/14/2024 (Mobley, Ashley)
June 12, 2024 Filing 31 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #30 Order Granting Motion to Approve Stipulated Scheduling Order in a Small Business Chapter 11 Case (Related Doc #29) Entered on Docket 6/10/2024 (Mobley, Ashley) ) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 06/12/2024. (Admin.)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Granting Motion to Approve Stipulated Scheduling Order in a Small Business Chapter 11 Case (Related Doc #29) Entered on Docket 6/10/2024 (Mobley, Ashley)
June 10, 2024 Filing 29 Motion for Issuance of Order Motion to Approve Stipulated Scheduling Order in a Small Business Chapter 11 Case filed by US Trustee. (Mansfield, MaryBeth)
June 10, 2024 Filing 28 Joint Stipulation By and Between United States Trustee and Debtor-in-Possession regarding Scheduling Order in a Small Business Chapter 11 Case filed by US Trustee. (Mansfield, MaryBeth)
June 9, 2024 Filing 27 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing(RE: related document(s) #26 Hearing SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s) #7 Motion for Authority to Use Bank OZK as DIP Depository Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc., #25 Limited Objection to Motion to Authorize Depository for DIP Bank Account (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion for Authority to Use Bank OZK as DIP Depository Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. filed by Debtor Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (ust)) Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2024 at 09:00 AM at Fort Smith Division.) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 06/09/2024. (Admin.)
June 7, 2024 Filing 26 Hearing SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s) #7 Motion for Authority to Use Bank OZK as DIP Depository Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc., #25 Limited Objection to Motion to Authorize Depository for DIP Bank Account (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion for Authority to Use Bank OZK as DIP Depository Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. filed by Debtor Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (ust)) Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2024 at 09:00 AM at Fort Smith Division. (Williams, Lisa)
June 6, 2024 Filing 25 Limited Objection to Motion to Authorize Depository for DIP Bank Account (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion for Authority to Use Bank OZK as DIP Depository Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. filed by Debtor Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (ust) (Mansfield, MaryBeth)
May 31, 2024 Filing 24 Motion for Approval TO ESCROW FUNDS FOR ADVANCE FEES AND EXPENSES FOR CHAPTER 11 SUBCHAPTER V TRUSTEE and Notice of Opportunity to Object Filed by Beverly I Brister on behalf of Beverly I Brister (Attachments: #1 Notice of Opportunity to Object) (Brister, Beverly)
May 27, 2024 Filing 23 Request by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Designating Mailing Address for Notices pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002(g)(1), requesting service of copies of all future notices at the address specified in the process of filing this Request Filed by (Sharma, Amitkumar)
May 27, 2024 Filing 22 Request by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Designating Mailing Address for Notices pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002(g)(1), requesting service of copies of all future notices at the address specified in the process of filing this Request Filed by (Sharma, Amitkumar)
May 22, 2024 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #13 Memorandum of Document Deficiency to Stanly Bond Regarding Signature (RE: related document(s) #2 Corporate Resolution Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Debtor Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/22/2024. (Admin.)
May 22, 2024 Filing 20 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors(RE: related document(s) #15 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/26/2024 at 11:00 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 8/26/2024.) No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 05/22/2024. (Admin.)
May 22, 2024 Filing 19 Request by Rapid Finance Designating Mailing Address for Notices pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002(g)(1), requesting service of copies of all future notices at the address specified in the process of filing this Request. (Brinkley, Renee)
May 22, 2024 Filing 18 Request by Ally Bank Designating Mailing Address for Notices pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002(g)(1), requesting service of copies of all future notices at the address specified in the process of filing this Request Filed by (Sharma, Amitkumar)
May 22, 2024 Filing 17 Request by Ally Bank Designating Mailing Address for Notices pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002(g)(1), requesting service of copies of all future notices at the address specified in the process of filing this Request Filed by (Sharma, Amitkumar)
May 21, 2024 Filing 16 Affidavit Re: Documents Required by 11 USC s.1116 (RE: related document(s) #9 Order of Deficiency) filed by Stanley V Bond Debtor Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 P&L #2 2022 Federal and Several States Income Tax Returns) (Bond, Stanley)
May 20, 2024 Filing 15 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/26/2024 at 11:00 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 8/26/2024. (Mansfield, MaryBeth)
May 20, 2024 Filing 14 Corporate Resolution Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Debtor Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. (Bond, Stanley)
May 20, 2024 Filing 13 Memorandum of Document Deficiency to Stanly Bond Regarding Signature (RE: related document(s) #2 Corporate Resolution Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Debtor Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.) (Mobley, Ashley)
May 20, 2024 Filing 12 Notice Appointing Ch. 11 Subchapter V Trustee (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee, Beverly I. Brister)(Mansfield, MaryBeth)
May 19, 2024 Filing 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing(RE: related document(s) #8 Order Setting Status Conference Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic Hearing. Pre-Status Report Due By 7/9/2024. Entered on 5/17/2024 (Carter, Angie)) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 05/19/2024. (Admin.)
May 19, 2024 Filing 10 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #9 Order of Deficiency Small Business Statement of Operations due 5/23/2024 Small Business Balance Sheet due: 5/23/2024 Federal Income Tax Return due: 5/23/2024. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due 5/23/2024) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/19/2024. (Admin.)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order of Deficiency Small Business Statement of Operations due 5/23/2024 Small Business Balance Sheet due: 5/23/2024 Federal Income Tax Return due: 5/23/2024. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due 5/23/2024 (Mobley, Ashley)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Status Conference Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic Hearing. Pre-Status Report Due By 7/9/2024. Entered on 5/17/2024 (Carter, Angie)
May 16, 2024 Filing 7 Motion for Authority to Use Bank OZK as DIP Depository Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. (Bond, Stanley)
May 16, 2024 Filing 6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. (Bond, Stanley)
May 16, 2024 Filing 5 Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bond, Stanley)
May 16, 2024 Filing 4 Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Disinterestedness) (Bond, Stanley)
May 16, 2024 Filing 3 RECEIPT of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 2:24-bk-70811) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. receipt number A8539615, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Resolution Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Debtor Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc. (Bond, Stanley)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 08/14/2024. (Bond, Stanley)

Search for this case: Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Hutchens Perry Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Stanley V Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee (ust)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Beverly I Brister
Represented By: Beverly I Brister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?