McMurrain, et al v. Creslenn Oil Company, et al
Plaintiff: Marilyn Johnson, R J McHenry, C B Norman, Annie Ruth Hicks, Dennis Norman, Nitral Hicks, Cora Cook Thompson, Carol - Wayne, Estalula King, Ruby Jean Williams, Linda Hicks, Odis Cook, Barbara McHenry, Ola B Traylor, Angela Cunningham, Shawn Bridges, Joe Willie Norman, Ossie B Gentle, Ladelle Kendrix, Dewanda Bridges, Bessie Allen, Calvin Hicks, Melva Hicks, Eloise McHenry, Mable Ford, Mildred Sue Redden, Zella Ruth Hicks, Dora Lee Ward, Alvin Hicks, Jr., Martha Norman, Rachel Jones, Ollie Hicks, Thomas - Cook, Erma Hall, Jesse McHenry, Jr., Waymonn McMurrian, Clara Hicks, Gus Norman, Estate of, Raymond McMurrain, Kenny Greenwood, Fern Redden Mason, Ruby Lee McMurrain, Lillie Wilson, Larry Hicks, Willie Wallace, Alton Thomas, Richard Echelburger, Geneva Hicks, Mary Norman, Garland Hicks, B J McHenry, Marie Cook, Virgie Sue White, Robert McMurrian, Sr., Catherine Redden Ricks, Wesley Bridges, Roosevelt Hicks, Carry Kendrix, Lee Andrew Hicks, Minnie R Burns, Milton Hicks, Willie Lee Norman, Gary Lamar Bridges, Thelma Norman, Qyrtice McHenry, Rosenell Hicks, Charles Johnson, Henry Norman, Jr., Alton Thomas, Jr., Curtis Hicks, Mamie Norman, James Kendrix, Kevin Cook, Frankie Kendrix, Arthur Greenwood, Jr., Estella Brock, Robert McMurrian, Jr. and Mattie Norman
Defendant: Urbana Well Servicing Company, Inc., EMCO Oil Company, Pan-Am Southern Corporation, Murphy North Sea, Inc., Claude Donahue, Pharmacia Corporation, Robert E McDowell, Marine Oil Company, Tosco Corporation, Southwest Royalties, Inc., Lion Oil Company, Murphy Corporation, Murphy Oil Corporation, Southwest Exploration and Acquisition Company, Creslenn Oil Company, McCreslenn Oil Company, Root Petroleum Corporation, New Murphy Oil Corp, W Wesley Webb, Service Pipeline Company, Lion Oil Refinery, Detex Oil Corporation, Bigheart Pipe Line Corporation, Deminex U.S. Oil Company, Monsanto Company, Pan American Petroleum Corporation, Koch Industries, Inc. and BP Pipelines (North America)
Case Number: 1:2002cv01048
Filed: April 23, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2002. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren denying motion for attorney fees [12-1] denying motion for costs & expenses [12-2] (cc: all counsel) (ct)
September 17, 2002 Filing 19 REPLY by defendants to response to motion for attorney fees [12-1] and for costs & expenses [12-2] (cn)
September 11, 2002 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM BRIEF by plaintiffs in support of motion response [17-1] (cn)
September 11, 2002 Filing 17 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to motion for attorney fees [12-1], and for costs & expenses [12-2] (cn)
September 10, 2002 Filing 16 RESPONSE & MEMO BRIEF in opposition by plaintiffs to motion for attorney fees [12-1] and for costs & expenses [12-2] (cn)
August 19, 2002 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of documents Union Cty Circuit Clerk (cn)
August 19, 2002 Filing 14 RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by defendant, plaintiff (cn)
August 19, 2002 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF by defendants in support of motion for attorney fees [12-1] and of motion for costs & expenses [12-2] (cn)
August 19, 2002 Filing 12 MOTION by defendants for attorney fees and for costs & expenses (cn)
August 15, 2002 Filing 11 COPY OF LETTER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren (cc: all counsel) (jn)
August 15, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren granting plaintiff's motion to remand to the Circuit Court of Union County, Arkansas [8-1] remanding case to state court (cc: all counsel) (jn)
August 12, 2002 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM BRIEF by plaintiffs in support of motion to remand to the Circuit Court of Union County, Arkansas [8-1] (cn)
August 12, 2002 Filing 8 MOTION by plaintiff to remand to the Circuit Court of Union County, Arkansas (rwg)
June 14, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren setting Rule 26(f) Report Deadline 8/16/02 final scheduling order will issue on 8/26/02 ; jury trial set for 8:30 1/27/03 (cc: all counsel) (gg)
June 3, 2002 Filing 6 ANSWER by defendant EMCO Oil Company to 1st amd complt of Fred Myers [1-1] (cn)
May 23, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren denying motion to dismiss case for insufficient service [1-1]; if Emco Oil desires to re-file the motion, it shall be filed within 14 days and shall be accompanied by a brief (cc: all counsel) (jn)
May 13, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren granting motion to substitute Gary Burbank as attorney of record in place of WH Armstrong; [3-1] withdrawing attorney William H. Armstrong for W Wesley Webb and substituting attorney Gary R. Burbank (cc: all counsel) (jn) Modified on 05/14/2002
April 24, 2002 Filing 3 MOTION by defendant W Wesley Webb to substitute Gary Burbank as attorney of record in place of WH Armstrong attorney (cn)
April 24, 2002 Filing 2 MEMO of reassignment to Honorable Jimm L. Hendren (cc: all counsel) (cn)
April 24, 2002 FILING FEE PAID: on 4/23/02 in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 55380. (cn)
April 23, 2002 Filing 1 MOTION & BRIEF IN SUPPORT by defendant EMCO Oil Company to dismiss case for insufficient service (cn)
April 23, 2002 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Union Cty Circuit Court Case Number: CIV 2001-213 w/copies of entire file from Union Cty (cn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMurrain, et al v. Creslenn Oil Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urbana Well Servicing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Ray Burbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMCO Oil Company
Represented By: Ian W. Vickery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan-Am Southern Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy North Sea, Inc.
Represented By: James E. Baine
Represented By: Robert C. Compton
Represented By: Jeffery P. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Brian H. Ratcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E McDowell
Represented By: Gary Ray Burbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tosco Corporation
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Royalties, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. McCarty
Represented By: Gill A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Oil Company
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Represented By: Brian H. Ratcliff
Represented By: Jane Weisenfels Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Corporation
Represented By: James E. Baine
Represented By: Robert C. Compton
Represented By: Jeffery P. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Oil Corporation
Represented By: James E. Baine
Represented By: Robert C. Compton
Represented By: Jeffery P. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Exploration and Acquisition Company
Represented By: Michael L. McCarty
Represented By: Gill A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creslenn Oil Company
Represented By: Michael L. McCarty
Represented By: Gill A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCreslenn Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Root Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Murphy Oil Corp
Represented By: James E. Baine
Represented By: Robert C. Compton
Represented By: Jeffery P. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Wesley Webb
Represented By: Gary Ray Burbank
Represented By: William H. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Pipeline Company
Represented By: Robert C. Compton
Represented By: Jeffery P. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Oil Refinery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detex Oil Corporation
Represented By: Michael L. McCarty
Represented By: Gill A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bigheart Pipe Line Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deminex U.S. Oil Company
Represented By: Michael L. McCarty
Represented By: Gill A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Brian H. Ratcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan American Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Robert C. Compton
Represented By: Jeffery P. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Winford L. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Pipelines (North America)
Represented By: Robert C. Compton
Represented By: Jeffery P. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Johnson
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R J McHenry
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C B Norman
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Ruth Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Norman
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nitral Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Cook Thompson
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol - Wayne
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estalula King
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Jean Williams
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odis Cook
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara McHenry
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ola B Traylor
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Cunningham
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Bridges
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Willie Norman
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ossie B Gentle
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladelle Kendrix
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewanda Bridges
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Allen
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melva Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloise McHenry
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mable Ford
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Sue Redden
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zella Ruth Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Lee Ward
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Hicks, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Norman
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ollie Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas - Cook
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erma Hall
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse McHenry, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waymonn McMurrian
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gus Norman, Estate of
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond McMurrain
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Greenwood
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fern Redden Mason
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Lee McMurrain
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Wilson
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Wallace
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton Thomas
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Echelburger
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Norman
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garland Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B J McHenry
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Cook
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgie Sue White
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McMurrian, Sr.
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Redden Ricks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Bridges
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carry Kendrix
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Andrew Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnie R Burns
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Lee Norman
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lamar Bridges
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Norman
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qyrtice McHenry
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosenell Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Johnson
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Norman, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Hicks
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamie Norman
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kendrix
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Cook
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Kendrix
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Greenwood, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estella Brock
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McMurrian, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie Norman
Represented By: Dennis J. Davis
Represented By: Ted G Boswell
Represented By: Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?