Harris v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 1:2006cv01057
Filed: June 1, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2007 10 JUDGMENT: Affirming decision of SSA; case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on April 25, 2007. (cnn)
April 25, 2007 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on April 25, 2007. (cnn)
February 21, 2007 ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant. Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to the case. (cnn)
September 28, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
September 13, 2006 TEXT ONLY Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on September 13, 2006. (bak)
September 13, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (bak)
August 16, 2006 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by David L Harris. (Thornton, Denver)
August 4, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/5/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/3/2006. (cnn)
August 2, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Webb, Mark)
June 29, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on 6/29/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Exhibit B - Government's Consent)(cap)
June 1, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (cnn)
June 1, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on June 1, 2006. (cnn)
June 1, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David L Harris. (cnn)
June 1, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by David L Harris.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?