Story v. Knighton et al

Plaintiff: Kendrick C Story
Defendant: Calvin Knighton, Victor Reynolds and Janet Delaney
Case Number: 1:2007cv01032
Filed: April 30, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT/ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 78 in favor of Kendrick C Story against defendants; granting motion for judgment 48 ; plaintiff is awarded $2100 in compensatory damages and defendants are ordered to pay the $350 filing fee. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 15, 2009. (cnn)
June 16, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Kendrick C Story; Objections to R&R due by 7/6/2009; recommending the plaintiff be awarded compensatory damages in the amount of $2100 against defendants and the defendants be required to pay the $350 filing fee that has been assessed against the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 16, 2009. (cnn)
September 11, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 24 ; Granting and Denying in parts defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 14 . Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on September 11, 2008. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Story v. Knighton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick C Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Knighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?