Perez-Benites et al v. Candy Brand, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rosalino Perez-Benites, Luis Alberto Asencio-Vasquez and Pascual Noriega-Narvaez
Defendant: Candy Brand, LLC, Arkansas Tomato Shippers, LLC, Charles Searcy, Randy Clanton, Dale McGinnis and Brooks Linesby
Case Number: 1:2007cv01048
Filed: June 7, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Bradley
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2013 292 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiffs against separate defendamts Arkansas Tomato Shippers, LLC, Candy Brand, LLC in the amount of $790,625.00; interest at the rate of 5.00% from 1/1/12 until paid; in addition to costs and attorney fees to be calculated at the time judgment is collected. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 4, 2013. (cnn)
April 9, 2012 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 279 Motion Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Entry of Final Judgment; Case dismissed with prejudice subject to terms of settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on April 9, 2012. (cnn)
May 20, 2011 252 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 194 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 197 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 198 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 203 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 205 Motion for Summary Judgment; Status Conference being held 5/20/11 to discuss remaining issues for trial. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 20, 2011. (cnn)
March 31, 2010 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving re 169 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to separate defendant Dale McGinnis; Claims against Dale McGinnis are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 31, 2010. (cnn)
March 23, 2010 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 Motion to Certify Class; certified in two classes. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 23, 2010. (cnn)
October 31, 2008 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Conditional Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 31, 2008. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Benites et al v. Candy Brand, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalino Perez-Benites
Represented By: Martin W. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Asencio-Vasquez
Represented By: Martin W. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pascual Noriega-Narvaez
Represented By: Martin W. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candy Brand, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Tomato Shippers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Searcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks Linesby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?