Story v. Lucas et al
Plaintiff: Kendrick C Story
Defendant: David Norwood, Joe Strickland, Paul Lucas and Chris Gill
Case Number: 1:2007cv01062
Filed: July 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; 64 Report and Recommendations; case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on August 30, 2010. (cnn)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 55 ; granting and denying in parts the 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; claims against Joe Strickland, Chris Gill and Paul Lucas dismissed; claim against David Norwood still pending. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 16, 2010. (cnn)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chris Gill, David Norwood, Joe Strickland, Paul Lucas; Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 25, 2010. (cnn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Story v. Lucas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick C Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?