Montize et al v. Pittman Properties et al

Plaintiff: Arcelia Montize, Evencio Garcia and Agustin Garcia Gonzalez
Defendant: Pittman Properties Limited Partnership #1, D&M Pittman, Incorporated, Dawood Aydani, Mickey H Pittman and Pittman Nursery Corporation
Case Number: 1:2007cv01073
Filed: August 23, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2015 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER releasing funds held in the registry of the Court. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 21, 2015. (mll)
September 16, 2011 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 258 Motion to Dismiss Party Dawood Aydani and plaintiffs' claims against defendants Pittman Properties Limited Partnership #1, D&M Pittman, Inc, and Mickey H. Pittman have been settled. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 16, 2011. (cnn)
August 22, 2011 239 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 238 Motion to Dismiss Party; Defendants, Pittman Properties Limited Partnership #1, D&M Pittman, Incorporated and Mickey H Pittman are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 22, 2011. (cnn)
May 12, 2011 210 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 194 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 12, 2011. (cnn)
July 6, 2010 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting and denying in parts 148 Motion to Dismiss Parties. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 6, 2010. (cnn)
June 24, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 145 Motion to Dismiss defendants in class certification; claims for class certification or collective action against separate defendants Pittman Properties Limited Partnership #1; D&M Pittman, Incorporated; Dawood Aydani; and Mickey H. Pittman are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on June 24, 2010. (cnn)
March 16, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 16, 2010. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montize et al v. Pittman Properties et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arcelia Montize
Represented By: Winford L. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evencio Garcia
Represented By: Winford L. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Garcia Gonzalez
Represented By: Winford L. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittman Properties Limited Partnership #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&M Pittman, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawood Aydani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey H Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittman Nursery Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?