Hortica-Florists' Mutual Insurance Company v. Pittman Nursery Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Hortica-Florists' Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Pittman Nursery Corporation, Donna Sue Pittman King, Pittman Properties Limited Partnership #1, Dawood Aydani, Bill Feazell, D&M Pittman, Incorporated, Arcelia Montize, Evencio Garcia, Agustin Garcia Gonzalez, Mickey H Pittman and John Michael Hunter
Case Number: 1:2007cv01119
Filed: December 26, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2014 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 284 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 286 Corrected Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $214,283.75 to be paid within 30 days of the date of this Order. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 9, 2014. (mll)
January 10, 2012 258 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Plaintiff Hortica's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law 249 is granted; JUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES: Defendant Pittman Nursery Corporation's Motion for Attorney Fees 247 is granted and denied in part; Hortica is directed to pay the amount of $30,275.00 in attorney fees covering the balance owed for cost of defense in Muniz Case; case is dismissed with prejudice; parties are instructed to bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 10, 2012. (cnn)
August 22, 2011 179 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 168 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 22, 2011. (cnn)
August 9, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 172 Motion to Dismiss; Claims and counterclaims between Hortica-Florists' Mutual and Arcelia Muniz aka Arcelia Montize, Evencio Garcio, and Agustin Garcia Gonzalez are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 9, 2011. (cnn)
August 30, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 126 Second Cross - Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, as it relates to Horticas duty to defend PNC in the Aydani lawsuit. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on August 30, 2010. (cnn)
March 2, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 96 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 2, 2010. (cnn)
October 27, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion to Dismiss Party; Dawood Aydani Terminated. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 27, 2009. (cnn)
December 8, 2008 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion to Dismiss by separate defendant Bill Feazell. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on December 8, 2008. (cnn)
October 9, 2008 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; Pittman Properties Limited Partnership #1; D&M Pittman, Incorporated and Mickey H Pittman are dismissed with prejudice from this action. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 9, 2008. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hortica-Florists' Mutual Insurance Company v. Pittman Nursery Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hortica-Florists' Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristine G. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittman Nursery Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Sue Pittman King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittman Properties Limited Partnership #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawood Aydani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Feazell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&M Pittman, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcelia Montize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evencio Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agustin Garcia Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey H Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Michael Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?