Pilgrim's Pride Fair Labor Standards Act Litigation - MDL 1832 v. et al Featured Case

Case Number: 1:2007cv01832
Filed: May 11, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2010 Court Recording of Motion to Approve Settlement held on 4/2/10, by Court Reporter Donna McKinney, Tape No. DM 10-17, Location of Tape: El Dorado. (cnn)
April 2, 2010 70 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Motion for approval of Settlement Agreement; Parties have settled with class members; Parties to report to the court the status of distribution of funds; court will retain jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on April 2, 2010. (cc: MDL Panel)(cnn)
April 2, 2010 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Harry F. Barnes: Final Settlement Hearing held on 4/2/2010. (rwg)
March 31, 2010 68 MOTION for Settlement (Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Joseph Sellers in Support of Settlement Between Plaintiffs and Pilgrim's Pride, # 4 Exhibit C - Notice to Excluded Workers, # 5 Exhibit D - Notice to Unconfirmed Workers)(Sellers, Joseph)
June 29, 2009 67 OBJECTION(S) by All Plaintiffs re (66 in 1:07-cv-01832-HFB) Joint 66 MOTION to Remand Agreed Request for Suggestion of Remand of DOL Litigation and Brief in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-01832-HFB, 1:06-cv-01082-HFB, 1:07-cv-01040-HFB, 1:07-cv-01041-HFB, 1:07-cv-01042-HFB, 1:07-cv-01043-HFB, 1:07-cv-01058-HFB, 1:07-cv-01059-HFB, 1:07-cv-01060-HFB, 1:07-cv-01082-HFB, 1:07-cv-01083-HFB, 1:07-cv-01084-HFB, 1:07-cv-01085-HFB, 1:07-cv-01105-HFB, 1:07-cv-01106-HFB, 1:07-cv-01107-HFB, 1:08-cv-01011-HFB(Sellers, Joseph) Modified on 6/30/2009 (cnn).
February 26, 2009 66 Joint MOTION to Remand Agreed Request for Suggestion of Remand of DOL Litigation and Brief in Support by All Defendants, All Plaintiffs. (Brown, John)
December 23, 2008 65 NOTICE OF FILING OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on November 19, 2008, before Judge Harry F. Barnes. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Donna McKinney, Telephone number 870-862-1303. Tape Number: DM 08-46. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it,or a redacted transcript, may be obtained through PACER. A Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of the Transcript MUST be filed within 7 calendar days of the filing of the transcript and served manually on the court reporter/transcriber. Redaction Request due 1/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2009. (cnn)
December 8, 2008 64 RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs (Secretary of Labor) re 63 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy. (Hurt, Brian) Modified on 12/9/2008 for clarification (cnn).
December 2, 2008 63 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy by All Defendants (Brown, John)
November 25, 2008 62 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 61 MOTION to Amend/Correct Consolidated Complaint and Join Additional Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y)(Sellers, Joseph)
November 25, 2008 61 MOTION to Amend/Correct Consolidated Complaint and Join Additional Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Sellers, Joseph)
November 25, 2008 60 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on November 25, 2008. (copy to MDL Panel)(cnn)
November 24, 2008 Court Recording of Hearing held on 11/19/08, by Court Reporter Donna McKinney, Tape No. DM 08-46, Location of Tape: El Dorado. (cnn)
November 19, 2008 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Harry F. Barnes: Status Conference held on 11/19/2008. (rwg)
November 14, 2008 58 REPLY by All Defendants re 55 Response to Supplemental Report Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 26.1. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Brown, John)
November 14, 2008 57 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Firm Name Change (Sellers, Joseph)
October 31, 2008 56 Featured Case ORDER Resetting Hearing: Status Conference reset for 11/19/2008 @ 10:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Harry F. Barnes. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 31, 2008. (rwg)
October 24, 2008 55 RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs re 52 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sellers, Joseph)
October 23, 2008 54 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/17/2008 @ 01:00 PM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Harry F. Barnes. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 23, 2008. (rwg)
October 10, 2008 53 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Sellers, Joseph)
October 10, 2008 52 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Brown, John)
May 14, 2008 51 Featured Case ORDER re: notice of suit to potential opt-in plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on May 14, 2008. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(cnn)
April 17, 2008 50 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 46 Reply to Response to Motion, (Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Sur-reply Concerning Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Court-Authorized Notice) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D)(Sellers, Joseph)
April 17, 2008 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 49 Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Sur-reply. Plaintiffs shall file their Response within five (5) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on 4/17/2008. (ljl) Modified on 4/18/2008 to add "text only" (cnn).
April 16, 2008 49 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Sur-reply Concerning Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Court-Authorized Notice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Response to Def's. Sur-Reply), # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D)(Sellers, Joseph)
April 14, 2008 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Certify Class (Consolidated Motion for Certification of a Collective Action and Court-Supervised Notice) Defendant's Sur-Reply Concerning Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Court-Authorized Notice filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O)(Brown, John)
April 10, 2008 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 47 Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Supplemental Objections to Court-Authorized Notice. Defendant has up to and including 3/14/2008 to file its Surreply. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on 4/10/2008. (ljl) Modified on 4/10/2008 to correct signature date (cnn).
April 9, 2008 47 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Supplemental Objections to Court-Authorized Notice by All Defendants. (Brown, John)
April 7, 2008 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION to Certify Class (Consolidated Motion for Certification of a Collective Action and Court-Supervised Notice) Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Supplemental Objections to Court-Authorized Notice filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Modified Proposed Notice), # 2 Exhibit B (Consent to Join))(Sellers, Joseph)
March 31, 2008 45 NOTICE by Pilgrim's Pride Fair Labor Standards Act Litigation re 44 Objection(s), Objection(s) of Substitution of Exhibit to Supplemental Objections to Court-Authorized Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brown, John)
March 31, 2008 44 OBJECTION(S) by All Defendants re 42 Order on Motion to Certify Class re Court-Authorized Notice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Brown, John)
March 24, 2008 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 43 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Supplement Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Notice. Defendant should file supplemental objections to Plaintiffs' proposed class notice on or before March 31, 2008. Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to any such objections is April 7, 2008. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on 3/24/2008. (ljl)
March 21, 2008 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplement Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Notice by Pilgrim's Pride Fair Labor Standards Act Litigation. (Brown, John)
March 13, 2008 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part the 28 Motion to Certify Class. The Court certifies this action as a collective action. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 13, 2008. (cnn)
November 20, 2007 Remark: Receipt of certified copies (docket sheet, complaint and answer) from the United States District Court, Eastern District of Pennsylvania, No. 2:06-3201 Juan Garcia, et al v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (OUR CASE NO. 1:07cv1107) (rw)
November 2, 2007 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION to Certify Class (Consolidated Motion for Certification of a Collective Action and Court-Supervised Notice) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit 50# 3 Exhibit 51# 4 Exhibit 52# 5 Exhibit 53# 6 Exhibit 54# 7 Exhibit 55)(Sellers, Joseph)
November 2, 2007 Remark: Receipt of copies (docket sheet, complaint and answer) from United States District Court, Northern District of Georgia (Rome) No. 4:07-cv-00020 Victor Hernandez v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (OUR CASE NO. 1:07CV1059) (cnn)
October 30, 2007 40 TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 USC 1407; actions listed pending on Schedule-A are transferred to the Western District of Arkansas-ElDorado Division from the ED/PA. (Attachments: # 1 MDL Attorney List) (cc: MDL Panel) (cnn)
October 30, 2007 Remark: Receipt of copies (docket sheet, complaint and answer) from United States District Court, Northern District of Georgia (Gainsville) No. 2:07-cv-00056 Daisy Hammond v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (OUR CASE NO. 1:07CV1085) (cnn)
October 30, 2007 Remark: Receipt of copies (docket sheet, complaint and answer) from United States District Court, Northern District of Georgia (Atlanta) No. 1:07-cv-01156 Gary Price v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (OUR CASE NO. 1:07CV1084) (cnn)
October 30, 2007 Remark: Receipt of copies (docket sheet, complaint and answer) from United States District Court, Middle District of Georgia (Athens) No. 3:07-cv-00052 Kristin Roebuck v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (OUR CASE NO. 1:07CV1083) (cnn)
October 30, 2007 Remark: Receipt of copies (docket sheet, complaint and answer) from United States District Court, Middle District of Georgia (Athens) No. 3:07-cv-00019 Angela W. Allen v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (OUR CASE NO. 1:07CV1082) (cnn)
October 30, 2007 39 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 3. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on October 30, 2007. (cnn)
October 29, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 38 Motion for Order. The Court will issue Case Management Order No. 3 on 10/30/2007. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on 10/29/2007. (ljl) Modified on 10/30/2007 to add "text only" (cnn).
October 16, 2007 38 Unopposed MOTION for Order (Case Management Order 3) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph)
October 12, 2007 37 RESPONSE & BRIEF in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Certify Class (Consolidated Motion for Certification of a Collective Action and Court-Supervised Notice) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I# 2 Exhibit J-S# 3 Exhibit T-Z)(Brown, John) Modified on 10/15/2007 to add "brief" text (cnn).
October 11, 2007 36 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Prohibit Conduct in Violation of Rules of Professional Conduct. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on October 11, 2007. (cnn)
October 3, 2007 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re 30 MOTION to Prohibit Conduct in Violation of Rules of Professional Conduct filed by All Defendants. (Taylor, Mark)
October 3, 2007 34 RESPONSE to Motion re 30 MOTION to Prohibit Conduct in Violation of Rules of Professional Conduct filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sellers, Joseph)
October 2, 2007 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Prohibit Conduct in Violation of Rules of Professional Conduct filed by All Plaintiffs. (Tidwell, Kelly)
September 27, 2007 32 NOTICE by All Defendants Defendant Pilgrim's Pride Corporation's Supplemental Designation of Liaison Counsel (Brown, John)
September 25, 2007 31 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 30 MOTION to Prohibit Conduct in Violation of Rules of Professional Conduct by All Defendants. (Brown, John)
September 25, 2007 30 MOTION to Prohibit Conduct in Violation of Rules of Professional Conduct by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Brown, John)
September 21, 2007 29 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 28 MOTION to Certify Class (Consolidated Motion for Certification of a Collective Action and Court-Supervised Notice) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Exhibit 14# 16 Exhibit 15# 17 Exhibit 16# 18 Exhibit 17# 19 Exhibit 18# 20 Exhibit 19# 21 Exhibit 20# 22 Exhibit 21# 23 Exhibit 22# 24 Exhibit 23# 25 Exhibit 24# 26 Exhibit 25# 27 Exhibit 26# 28 Exhibit 27# 29 Exhibit 28# 30 Exhibit 29# 31 Exhibit 30# 32 Exhibit 31# 33 Exhibit 32# 34 Exhibit 33# 35 Exhibit 34# 36 Exhibit 35# 37 Exhibit 36# 38 Exhibit 37# 39 Exhibit 38# 40 Exhibit 39# 41 Exhibit 40# 42 Exhibit 41# 43 Exhibit 42# 44 Exhibit 43# 45 Exhibit 44# 46 Exhibit 45# 47 Exhibit 46# 48 Exhibit 47# 49 Exhibit 48# 50 Exhibit 49# 51 Exhibit 50)(Sellers, Joseph)
September 21, 2007 28 MOTION to Certify Class (Consolidated Motion for Certification of a Collective Action and Court-Supervised Notice) by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/12/2007 (Sellers, Joseph)
August 31, 2007 27 CTO-2 TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 USC 1407; further actions are transferred to the Western District of Arkansas-ElDorado Division (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A)(cnn)
August 20, 2007 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by All Plaintiffs, All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Sellers, Joseph)
August 3, 2007 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to Consolidated Complaint) by All Defendants.(Brown, John)
August 3, 2007 24 NOTICE by all plaintiffs of filing additional consents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Massey through Deckard# 2 Exhibit B Lackey through Gold# 3 Exhibit C Regina Washington)(Sellers, Joseph)
July 26, 2007 23 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Filing of Additional Consents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consents of Karen Constable and Paul Hines)(Sellers, Joseph)
July 20, 2007 22 NOTICE by all plaintiffs re 21 Amended Complaint Certificate of Service (Sellers, Joseph)
July 20, 2007 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants (Consolidated Collective Action Complaint), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sellers, Joseph)
July 20, 2007 20 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Filing of Additional Consents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Mt. Pleasant Consents# 2 Exhibit B - Moorefield, WV Consents# 3 Exhibit C - Athens, GA Consents)(Sellers, Joseph)
July 19, 2007 19 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 (cc: counsel). Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on July 19, 2007. (rw)
July 16, 2007 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 6, 2007 before Judge Harry F. Barnes. Court Reporter: Donna McKinney. (cnn)
July 10, 2007 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Brown on behalf of All Defendants (Brown, John)
July 10, 2007 17 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Plaintiffs' Notice of Appearance and Designation as Liaison Counsel) (Tidwell, Kelly)
July 10, 2007 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Sellers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sellers, Joseph)
July 9, 2007 15 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 1 . Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on July 9, 2007. (cc: counsel)(rw)
July 6, 2007 14 NOTICE by All Defendants of Designated Attorney List in re Pilgrim's Pride Fair Labor Standards Act Litigation (cnn)
July 6, 2007 13 NOTICE by Plaintiffs of Designated Attorney List in re Pilgrim's Pride Fair Labor Standards Act Litigation (cnn)
July 6, 2007 Court Recording of First Meeting held on 7/6/07, by Court Reporter Donna McKinney, Tape No. DM 07-34, Location of Tape: El Dorado. (cnn)
July 6, 2007 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Harry F. Barnes: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/6/2007. (rwg)
July 3, 2007 11 Featured Case UPDATED PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on July 2, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A - Case list# 2 MDL Attorney Service List)(copies mailed to MDL service list and Clerk MDL Panel)(cnn)
July 2, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The requirements of Rule 83.5 of the Rules of this Court are waived as to any attorney appearing in these actions who is duly admitted to practice before any United States Court. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on 07/02/2007. (ljl)
July 2, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The requirements of Rule 83.5 of the Local Rules of this Court are waived as to any attorney appearing in these actions who is duly admitted to practice before any United States Court. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on 07/02/2007. (ljl)
July 2, 2007 ****REFERENCE MUST BE MADE TO THE INDIVIDUAL DOCKET SHEET FOR ENTRIES RELATING ONLY TO INDIVIDUAL ACTIONS**** (cnn)
July 2, 2007 10 TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 USC 1407; actions listed pending on CTO-1 are transferred to the Western District of Arkansas-ElDorado Division (cnn)
June 29, 2007 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Pilgrim's Pride Corporation) by Pilgrim's Pride Fair Labor Standards Act Litigation. (Dougherty, Adam)
June 29, 2007 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Pilgrim's Pride Corporation) by Pilgrim's Pride Fair Labor Standards Act Litigation. (Taylor, Mark)
June 14, 2007 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 5 Motion to Substitute Liaison Counsel; attorney John B. Brown is added and Carrie Beth Hoffman terminated as Liaison counsel. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on June 14, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Copies mailed re: attorney service list and Clerk MDL Panel)(cnn)
June 11, 2007 6 NOTICE by Pilgrim's Pride Fair Labor Standards Act Litigation Notice of Filing Plaintiffs' consents to Representation (Attachments: # 1)(Burke, Peter)
June 8, 2007 5 MOTION to Substitute Attorney John B. Brown by Pilgrim's Pride Fair Labor Standards Act Litigation. (Hoffman, Carrie)
June 7, 2007 Remark: Receipt of certified copies (docket sheet, complaint, answer and amended answer) from United States District Court, North District of Alabama (Northeastern) No. 5:06-cv-1673 Salvador Aguilar v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (OUR CASE NO. 1:07CV1040) (cnn)
June 7, 2007 Remark: Receipt of certified copies (docket sheet, complaint and answer) from United States District Court, Northern District of Alabama (Northeastern) No. 5:06-cv-2337 Irene Benford v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (OUR CASE NO. 1:07CV1041) (cnn)
June 7, 2007 Remark: Receipt of certified copies (docket sheet, amended complaint and answer to amended complaint) from United States District Court, Eastern District of Texas (Texarkana) No. 5:06-cv-00089 Barry Antee v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (OUR CASE NO. 1:07CV1043) (cnn)
May 31, 2007 Remark: Receipt of original record from United States District Court, Eastern District of Tennessee(Chattanooga) No. 1:06-cv-00259 Rose Mary Porter v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (OUR CASE NO. 1:07CV1042) (rw)
May 30, 2007 4 NOTICE by Pilgrim's Pride Fair Labor Standards Act Litigation of Filing Consents to Representation to Joint Action Against the Defendant (Burke, Peter)
May 18, 2007 ****REFERENCE MUST BE MADE TO THE INDIVIDUAL DOCKET SHEET FOR ENTRIES RELATING ONLY TO INDIVIDUAL ACTIONS**** (cnn)
May 18, 2007 3 Featured Case PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2007 10:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Harry F. Barnes. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on May 18, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedule A)(cnn) (copies mailed to MDL service list - Peter Burke, Robert Camp, David Garrison, Carrie Hoffman, William Hommel, Michael Prieto, Joseph Sellers, and Clerk MDL) Additional attachment(s)# 2Attorney Service List added on 5/29/2007 (msj).
May 18, 2007 2 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedule A) (copies mailed to MDL service list: Peter Burke, Robert Camp, David Garrison, Carrie Hoffman, William Hommel, Michael Prieto, Joseph Sellers)(cnn)
May 11, 2007 1 TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 USC 1407; actions listed pending on Schedule A are transferred to the Western District of Arkansas-ElDorado Division, creating MDL 1832 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedule A)(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilgrim's Pride Fair Labor Standards Act Litigation - MDL 1832 v. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?