Radford v. Norwood et al

Plaintiff: Tommy Radford
Defendant: David Norwood, Joe Strickland, Tammi Poole, Chris Gill, Mark Speer, Detective Franklin, Glenn Lampkins and Jake McClane
Case Number: 1:2008cv01008
Filed: January 24, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT/ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 143 ; granting 135 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by separate defendants Detective Franklin, Tammi Poole; all remaining defendants in this action have been dismissed, plaintiff's case is now closed. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 31, 2011. (cnn)
February 17, 2011 132 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT/ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: adopting 130 Report and Recommendations and granting 122 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Glenn Lampkins, Chris Gill, David Norwood, Mark Speer, Joe Strickland, Jake McClane, parties dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on February 17, 2011. (cnn)
November 4, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 116 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 4, 2010. (lw)
July 26, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 107 ; granting 104 motion to dismiss separate defendants Thomas and Baker is granted with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 26, 2010. (cnn)
April 16, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 96 ; granting 99 MOTION to rectify and list correct name of defendant - Bobby Joe Johnson filed by Tommy Radford; matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for an order directing service of the Complaint and Summons on the Defendant whose correct name is Bobby Joe Johnson. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on April 16, 2010. (cnn)
October 16, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion to Extend and denying Motion to Dismiss dated 10/15/09. Plaintiff shall have until and including 11/16/09 at 5:00 p.m. to provide defendants with responses to their discovery requests. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's case. Further the Defendants may renew this motion if Plaintiff fails to comply with the deadlines as set forth. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 16, 2009. (lw)
September 4, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion for Order to stop payments. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 4, 2008. (tg) Modified on 9/4/2008 to correct text(tg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radford v. Norwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammi Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Lampkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake McClane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?