Ferrell v. Seedway, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bryan A Ferrell
Defendant: Seedway, LLC and Siegers Seed Company
Case Number: 1:2008cv01054
Filed: July 2, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Bradley
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Seedway, LLC, Siegers Seed Company against Del Sol Seed Company in the amount of $10,000.00 plus costs and attorney fees. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on February 3, 2010. (cnn)
September 1, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Consent Order: complaint of Brian A. Ferrell against defendants Seedway, LLC and Siegers Seed Company has been settled and those claims dismissed with prejudice; the third party complaint still remains pending. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on August 28, 2009. (cnn)
March 5, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion for Entry of Default; Clerk is directed to enter an entry of default against Third Party Defendant Del Sol Seed Company. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 5, 2009. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrell v. Seedway, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan A Ferrell
Represented By: John Frank Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seedway, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siegers Seed Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?