Andrews v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Trinity Andrews
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 1:2009cv01005
Filed: January 15, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Erin L. Setser
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : decision of SSA affirmed, case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on August 19, 2010. (cnn)
March 2, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE, ( Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 4/1/2010, Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/1/2010) Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on March 2, 2010. (cnn)
February 18, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT/ORDER: administratively terminating case; defendant directed to supplement the administrative record within 60 days. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on February 18, 2010. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Andrews
Represented By: R. Theodor Stricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?