Corn v. Jones et al

Plaintiff: Pete William Corn
Defendant: Ken Jones, John Williams, Lt. Bass, Gerry Avery, Dr Seal and Kelly Pepper
Case Number: 1:2009cv01015
Filed: March 19, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 50 ; Case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 9, 2011. (cnn)
September 30, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 40 granting and denying in parts 15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ken Jones, Lt. Bass, Kelly Pepper, Gerry Avery, John Williams; claims against Lt. Bass and Deputy Gary Aaron are dismissed. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on September 30, 2010. (cnn)
June 30, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REJECTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 34 ; CASE REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant for further disposition on motion(s) for summary judgment. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on June 30, 2010. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(cnn)
February 16, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Pete William Corn; REFERRING CASE to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on February 16, 2010. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(cnn)
January 22, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Pete William Corn, recommending case be dismissed based on Plaintiff's failure to obey the order of the court and his failure to prosecute this action. Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 22, 2010. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corn v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete William Corn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?