Rawls et al v. Union Pacific Railroad et al

Plaintiff: Cody Rawls, Jerry Rawls and Roy Dell Johnson
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad, Alfred Brown and Steve Holford
Case Number: 1:2009cv01037
Filed: August 14, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 234 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 27, 2012. (cnn)
July 10, 2012 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 10, 2012. (cnn)
August 5, 2011 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 104 ; denying 56 Motion to Dismiss filed by Alfred Brown, Union Pacific Railroad, Steve Holford. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on August 5, 2011. (cnn)
July 15, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 103 ; granting and denying in part 58 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 15, 2011. (cnn)
March 9, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 9, 2010. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawls et al v. Union Pacific Railroad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Rawls
Represented By: David P. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Rawls
Represented By: David P. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Dell Johnson
Represented By: David P. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad
Represented By: Scott H. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Brown
Represented By: Scott H. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Holford
Represented By: Scott H. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?