Nunn et al v. Arkansas Department of Human Services et al

Plaintiff: Berthena Nunn, KidsQuest Inc, Wanda Jackson and Neighborhood Community Outreach Inc
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services, John Selig and James Green
Case Number: 1:2010cv01063
Filed: September 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 43 Motion for Relief from Judgment under FRCP 60(b). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 7, 2013. (cnn)
September 27, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: adopting in part Report and Recommendations re 38 ; granting 26 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; plaintiffs claims against all defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 27, 2012. (cnn)
May 11, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss; all of Neighborhood Community Outreach Inc's claims against Defendants are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 11, 2012. (lw)
August 18, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 15 ; granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion to Dismiss; defendants have 10 days to file any response to plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 18, 2011. (cnn)
September 22, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 4 Motion to Transfer Case; the Clerk is directed to immediately transfer this case to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas, El Dorado Division. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/22/10. (vjt)[Transferred from ared on 9/23/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunn et al v. Arkansas Department of Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berthena Nunn
Represented By: Shawn G. Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KidsQuest Inc
Represented By: Shawn G. Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Jackson
Represented By: Shawn G. Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neighborhood Community Outreach Inc
Represented By: Shawn G. Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services
Represented By: Richard N. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Selig
Represented By: Richard N. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Green
Represented By: Richard N. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?